IL SB2799 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1076
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1076
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall adopt rules concerning sanitation requirements, requirements for education on sanitation, and any other health concerns associated with threading. Defines "threading" as any technique that results in the removal of superfluous hair from the body by twisting thread around unwanted hair and then pulling it from the skin; and may also include the incidental trimming of eyebrow hair. Provides that the term "cosmetology" does not include threading and that an "esthetician" does not mean a person who engages in threading and does not engage in the practice of esthetics. Effective immediately.
Title
BARBER ACT-REGULATE THREADING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-16 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1076 | |
2010-07-16 | Effective Date July 16, 2010 | |
2010-07-16 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2010-03-11 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2010 | |
2010-02-25 | Second Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-02-17 | Postponed - Licensed Activities | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading | |
2010-01-28 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |