IL SB2823 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. In provisions concerning the conviction of certain offenses as grounds for disqualification for licensure or suspension or revocation of a license, includes the sex offense of abuse by an educator or authority figure under the definition of "sex or other offense". Amends the Sex Offenses Article of Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits abuse by an educator or authority figure if that person holds a position of trust, authority, or supervision in relation to a student in a school, the student is at least 18 years of age, the person is at least 4 years older than the student, and the person either (1) commits an act of sexual conduct with the student or (2) commits an act of sexual penetration with the student. Provides that abuse by an educator or authority figure is a Class 3 felony for the first offense and a Class 2 felony for a second or subsequent offense or if there is more than one victim. Provides that consent of the victim is not a defense to abuse by an educator or authority figure. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Includes abuse by an educator or authority figure under the definitions of "sex offense" and "sexual predator".
Title
SEX OFFENSE-ABUSE BY EDUCATOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-9.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2823&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2823.htm |