IL SB2856 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Counseling Compact Act. Provides that the State of Illinois enters into the Counseling Compact. Specifies that the Compact's purpose is to facilitate interstate practice of licensed professional counselors with the goal of improving public access to professional counseling services. Sets out provisions concerning the privilege to practice, obtaining a new home state license, active duty military personnel, telehealth, adverse actions, Counseling Compact Commission, data systems, rulemaking, oversight, dispute resolution, and enforcement. Contains other provisions concerning the Commission, the Compact, and the procedures governing participating in and construction of the Compact. Amends the Professional Counselor and Clinical Professional Counselor Licensing and Practice Act. Requires the Professional Counselor Licensing and Disciplinary Board to submit a report to the General Assembly with recommendations of any statutory changes and budgetary changes needed to comply with the requirements of the Counseling Compact. Requires the Board and Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to modify, if needed, Board and Department rules to comply with the requirements of the Counseling Compact. Provides that the changes to the Professional Counselor and Clinical Professional Counselor Licensing and Practice Act are effective immediately.
Title
COUNSELING COMPACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2856&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2856.htm |