IL SB2877 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Specifies that the notice in contested case hearings must include an enclosure that notifies the recipient of the ability to request interpretive assistance for the hearing and to receive language assistance in translating the contents of the notice. Provides that an administrative law judge has the duty to inquire and determine whether a self-represented litigant or witness in a hearing needs interpretive assistance to participate in or understand the hearing. Authorizes any self-represented litigant, witness, or indigent person to request, at any time during the course of a hearing, interpretive assistance needed to participate in or understand the hearing. Provides that, if interpretive assistance is requested by a self-represented litigant, a witness, or an indigent person or if interpretive assistance is determined to be necessary by the administrative law judge, the administrative agency must appoint a foreign language interpreter at no cost to the person in need of the assistance for use in a substantive hearing. Authorizes an administrative agency to provide interpretive assistance during a nonsubstantive hearing through use of an interpreter who is not a foreign language interpreter, provided the administrative law judge examines the interpreter for competency for the purposes of the nonsubstantive hearing. Requires all persons appointed to provide interpretive assistance in substantive and nonsubstantive hearings to make certain affirmations. Contains provisions concerning waiver of these language assistance provisions.
Title
ADMIN PROC-LANGUAGE ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Directed to Multiple Committees State Government; Appropriations |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 10-25.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 10-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2877&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2877.htm |