IL SB2900 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Requires construction or maintenance zone speed limit signs to be equipped with flashing yellow lights that are in operation while workers are present in the construction or maintenance zone. Provides that special speed limits for construction and maintenance zones shall only be in effect when workers are present and flashing yellow lights indicating the presence of workers are in operation.
Title
WORK ZONE SPEED LIMITS
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Duffy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Duffy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-605.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2900&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2900.htm |