IL SB3023 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0764
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0764
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mechanics Lien Act. Provides that an agreement to subordinate a lien under the Act where the agreement is in anticipation of and in consideration for the awarding of a contract or subcontract, either express or implied, to perform work or supply materials for an improvement upon real property is against public policy and unenforceable. Deletes language providing that certain subordination provisions of contracts is not binding on the subcontractor unless set forth in its entirety in writing in the contract between the contractor and subcontractor or material supplier. Makes corresponding changes.
Title
MECHANICS LIENS-SUBORDINATION
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0764 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Effective Date July 16, 2014 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2014-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Mulroe |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-002-001 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
770 | 60 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
770 | 60 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |