IL SB3027 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that beginning after June 1, 2017, the chief operating officer of Amtrak or its successor shall no longer be required to certify to the State Treasurer the number of Amtrak tickets sold at the State rate during the current fiscal year. Provides that beginning July 1, 2017, the State Treasurer shall no longer be required to transfer from the General Revenue Fund to the Intercity Passenger Rail Fund an amount equal to the tickets certified by the chief operating officer of Amtrak multiplied by $50. Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Modifies the money received by the Department of Transportation under a Section concerning appropriation of proceeds from the sale of bonds. Amends the Downstate Public Transportation Act. Modifies the maximum eligible operating expenses for various participants under the Act. Modifies the transfer of funds by the Department of Transportation under a Section concerning residual fund balance. Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides for the costs of the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency for the administration of the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Law of 2005 to be paid by the State Comptroller and Treasurer from the Motor Fuel Tax Fund into the Vehicle Inspection Fund. Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act, the Clerks of Courts Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections to provide that all moneys in the Roadside Memorial Fund shall be used by the Department of Veterans' Affairs to pay for the cartage and erection of veterans' headstones. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT-FINANCE & FUNDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; McConnaughay |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-68 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-2.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 4.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 105 | 27.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 105 | 27.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |