IL SB3033 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Industrial Development Assistance Law. Allows local school districts and community colleges to apply for and receive grants under the Act for the acquisition of land, construction of facilities, and purchase of equipment, dedicated solely to the instruction of occupations in manufacturing. Provides additional eligibility requirements for local school districts and community colleges applying for grants under the Act. Modifies the term "industrial development agency" to include local school districts and community colleges.
Title
INDUSTRY DEVELOPMNT ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Weaver |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 720 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 720 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |