IL SB3054 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code to provide that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2023 shall provide coverage for compression sleeves. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
INS-HEALTH BENEFITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-10 | Senate | To Insurance Mandates |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Insurance Mandates |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |