IL SB3069 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Veterans Service Act. With regard to the requirement to advertise the office location and phone number of and Internet access to the Coordinator of Veterans and Military Personnel and Student Services, provides that the advertisement must also include the website and any social media accounts of the public college or university. Requires each public college and university to annually report to the Board of Higher Education on the efforts of the public college or university in attracting, recruiting, and retaining veterans and military personnel. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED VETERANS SERVICE ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-01-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 49 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 49 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |