IL SB3073 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee, State Universities, and Downstate Teachers Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires those Systems to offer certain inactive members the opportunity to elect to receive an accelerated pension benefit payment equal to 70% of the net present value of their pension benefits in lieu of receiving any pension benefit. Provides that if a person elects to receive an accelerated pension benefit payment, his or her credits and creditable service under that Article shall be terminated upon receipt of the accelerated pension benefit payment; except that the terminated service credit shall be used for the purposes of determining participation and benefits under the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that a person who receives an accelerated pension benefit payment must direct the System to pay all of that payment as a rollover into another qualified retirement plan or account. Contains provisions concerning return to active service; rulemaking; and qualified plan status. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971 to make related changes. Requires the Authority to issue bonds if the amount of the accelerated pension benefit payments exceed the amount appropriated to each System for those payments. Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Authorizes $250,000,000 in State Pension Obligation Acceleration Bonds to be sold to pay for accelerated pension benefit payments to eligible persons. Amends the State Pension Funds Continuing Appropriation Act to create a continuing appropriation for payments on those Bonds. Amends the State Finance Act to create the State Pension Obligation Acceleration Bond Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ACCEL BENEFIT PAYMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3501 | 801-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.886 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 330 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 7.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 330 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 15 | 1.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-147.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-185.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 15-198 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-190.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |