IL SB3074 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that for a policeman who retires from service after September 1, 1967 with at least 20 years of service credit and attains age 70 on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, any 3% automatic increase in annuity shall be compounded beginning with the increase following attainment of age 70. Specifies that for a policeman who attained age 70 before the effective date of the amendatory Act, any 3% automatic increase in annuity following the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be compounded. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply without regard to whether the policeman or annuitant terminated service before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHI POL-ANNUAL INCREASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 5-167.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3074&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3074.htm |