IL SB3093 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act and the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that, if any licensee authorized to sell alcoholic liquor at retail has had the renewal of his or her certificate of registration denied by the Department of Revenue or if such a licensee's certificate of registration has been revoked by the Department of Revenue, then the Department of Revenue shall file a notice with the Liquor Control Commission that includes a certification, signed by Director of Revenue or his or her designee, attesting that the renewal of the person's certificate of registration has been denied or that the person's certificate of registration has been revoked, as applicable, after notice and an opportunity to be heard. Provides that the Liquor Control Commission shall inactivate the license of that licensee until the Department of Revenue notifies the Liquor Control Commission that the violation resulting in the nonrenewal or revocation has been remedied and the certificate of registration has been reinstated by the Department of Revenue. Effective immediately
Title
ROTA-LIQUOR RETAILER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Liquor |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 1-3.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
235 | 5 | 7-6.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 120 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3093&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3093.htm |