IL SB3097 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Employee Sick Leave Act. Provides that employees may use personal sick leave benefits provided by the employer for absences due to an illness, injury, or medical appointment of the employee's child, spouse, sibling, parent, mother-in-law, father-in-law, grandchild, grandparent, or stepparent, for reasonable periods of time as the employee's attendance may be necessary, on the same terms upon which the employee is able to use sick leave benefits for the employee's own illness or injury. Provides that the Department of Labor shall issue rules to implement the Act. Effective January 1, 2017.
Title
EMPLOYEE SICK LEAVE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |