IL SB3097 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that the Elk Grove Rural Fire Protection District is dissolved by operation of law effective immediately upon the occurrence of specified conditions (rather than on July 31, 2024). Appoints the president of the board of trustees of the Elk Grove Rural Fire Protection District serving on October 1, 2023 and the mayor of the Village of Mount Prospect to close up the business affairs of the Elk Grove Rural Fire Protection District, needing unanimous agreement to approve actions. After the District is dissolved, allows any bank or other financial institution at which the District has accounts to transfer, upon presentment of a certified copy of the resolution passed by the Cook County Board of Commissioners approving the accounting, the funds in the District's accounts to the Village of Mount Prospect. Provides that, notwithstanding the Special Service Area Tax Law, the special service area created by the Village of Mount Prospect and approved by Cook County in order to take the place of the Elk Grove Rural Fire Protection District's tax levy after dissolution shall not require geographical contiguity. Removes provisions about the District delegating its authority and obligations to one or more authorized delegees and other provisions about winding up the affairs of the District after dissolution. Effective immediately.
Title
ELK GROVE FIRE PROTECTION DIST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |