IL SB3106 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides a new definition for a moderately intellectually disabled person and a severely or profoundly intellectually disabled person in the Section pertaining to hearsay exceptions for the admission of evidence in a prosecution for a physical or sexual act perpetrated upon or against a severely or profoundly intellectually disabled person or a moderately intellectually disabled person. Defines a moderately intellectually disabled person as a person, who at the time of the commission of the offense, suffers from a mental illness in which the person's ability to exercise rational judgment is impaired. Defines a severely or profoundly intellectually disabled person, as a person, who at the time of the commission of the offense, suffers from a significant mental illness to the extent that the person's ability to exercise rational judgment is impaired.
Title
CRIM PRO-INTELLECT DISABILITY
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0752 |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-05-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-002 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 115-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |