IL SB3112 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. William R. Haine
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. William R. Haine
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that no provision of the Act shall be construed to afford any rights to any person: (i) incarcerated in a State, local, or federal correctional facility; or (ii) in the custody of the Department of Human Services as unfit to stand trial or under the Sexually Violent Persons Commitment Act. Provides that the new provisions shall not be construed to prevent a person from exercising his or her constitutionally-protected rights. Exempts from disclosure under the Act records requested by persons committed to a county jail if those materials are available in the library of the jail. Exempts from inspection and copying information or materials received, generated, or maintained by a State's Attorney or county sheriff as part of the criminal discovery process that the disclosure of which would violate the Supreme Court Rule concerning the disclosure of discovery materials in felony cases. Provides that the exemption applies regardless of whether the case has concluded. Effective immediately.
Title
FOIA-PERSONS IN CUSTODY & INFO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Senate | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-020-001 |
2016-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-05-31 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-05-26 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-05-26 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-002-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 069-046-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Civil Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-05-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-19 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-05-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Judiciary |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 3.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |