IL SB3112 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. In provisions permitting the Department of Children and Family Services to offer and provide family preservation services to any child or family who is the subject of a report of suspected child abuse or neglect and who is likely to be the subject of future reports of suspected child abuse or neglect, provides that if the report is determined to be indicated, the family shall cooperate with and be provided family preservation services as defined in the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that if a report of child abuse or neglect is determined to be indicated, the child's family shall cooperate with and be provided family preservation services. Requires the Department to develop a service plan for the family's acceptance of services (rather than for the family's voluntary acceptance or refusal). Removes a requirement that the Department explain its lack of legal authority to compel the acceptance of services. Makes changes to the definition of "family preservation services".
Title
DCFS-FAMILY PRESERVATION SRVCS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 8.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |