IL SB3124 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to promulgate rules to increase by $10 for State fiscal year 2015 the total monthly personal needs allowance for persons who are inpatients in a facility licensed under the ID/DD Community Care Act for which payments are made under the Medical Assistance Article throughout a month and who are determined to be eligible for medical assistance. Provides that for State fiscal years 2016 and beyond, in any calendar year in which there is a cost-of-living increase in federal Supplemental Security Income benefits or Social Security benefits, the Department shall promulgate rules to increase the total monthly personal needs allowance by an amount that is at least equal to the increase in federal Supplemental Security Income benefits or Social Security benefits. Provides that the Department shall not be prohibited from increasing, by rule, for State fiscal years 2016 and beyond, the personal needs allowance by an amount that is greater than the cost-of-living increase in federal Supplemental Security Income benefits or Social Security benefits for that calendar year; and that at no time shall the personal needs allowance for eligible persons be reduced below the rates calculated for State fiscal year 2015. Authorizes the Department to make similar increases, by rule, for persons who reside in a facility licensed under the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act, who are determined to be eligible for medical assistance, and who are enrolled in the Illinois Home and Community Based Services Medicaid Waiver program for adults with developmental disabilities. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-PERSONAL NEEDS-INCREASES
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3124&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3124.htm |