IL SB3149 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Senior Citizens Real Estate Tax Deferral Act. Removes a limitation providing that the total amount of any deferral under the Act shall not exceed $5,000 per taxpayer in each tax year. Effective immediately.
Title
SENIOR TAX-REMOVE LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2012 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Johnson |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |