IL SB3202 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community Association Manager Licensing and Disciplinary Act. Provides that all community associations that (i) have 10 or more units, (ii) retain an individual to provide services as a community association manager for compensation, (iii) are not master associations, or (iv) are registered in the State as a not-for-profit corporation, shall pay to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation an annual fee of $50 plus an additional $1 per unit not to exceed an annual fee of $1,000. Provides that 4 years after the date of the final adoption of rules under the Act, and every 2 years thereafter, the Secretary and the Board shall review the number of licenses and the amount collected from community associations and make any necessary adjustment of the fees for both licensees and community associations, as recommended by the Board, to equal the costs of administration for the licensing program. Provides that all monies received or collected pursuant to the Act shall be deposited in the Community Association Manager Licensing and Disciplinary Fund for the administration of the Community Association Manager Licensing Program and to protect the financial interests of community associations. Provides that the Department shall provide to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014, a report that examines all of the Department's costs to enforce the provisions of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
COMMUNITY ASSOC-ANNUAL FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1021 |
2012-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date August 17, 2012 |
2012-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 15, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Andr |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Maloney |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2012 |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2012 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 427 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |