IL SB3206 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Electronics Recycling Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary, a lithium-ion battery may not be disposed of in a mixed recycling waste bin. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to encourage local authorities to use separate curbside recycling collection bins for the disposal of lithium-ion batteries. Requires the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency to adopt rules requiring each manufacturer of an electric vehicle that is sold in the State and contains a lithium-ion battery and each manufacturer of lithium-ion batteries sold in the State to submit a battery recycling plan to the Agency by June 1, 2025. Prohibits the disposal of lithium-ion batteries in sanitary landfills, beginning July 1, 2025. Amends the Hazardous Materials Emergency Act. Provides that "hazardous material" includes lithium-ion batteries for purposes of specified provisions of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTRONICS-LITHIUM BATTERIES
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 151 | 1-83.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 50 | 2.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 50 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 50 | 5.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 50 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3206&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3206.htm |