IL SB3219 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that property that is used for refining crude oil located in a county of less than 1,000,000 inhabitants, as to which litigation with respect to its assessed valuation is pending or was pending as of January 1, 2011, may be the subject of a real property tax assessment settlement agreement among the taxpayer and taxing districts in which it is situated. Provides that wind turbines and ethanol producing facilities (other than systems, methods, construction, devices, or appliances appurtenant to ethanol producing facilities) are not considered pollution control facilities. In a Section concerning valuation for pollution control facilities, provides that the Department of Revenue shall, when reasonable, (now, the Department "shall") consider certain factors when determining the fair cash value of the facility. Provides that the effective date of a pollution control facility certificate is January 1 of the year in which the certificate is issued. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-POLLUTION FACILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 11-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 11-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 11-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 9-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3219&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3219.htm |