IL SB3222 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Code. Deletes a paragraph requiring the Director of the Department of Central Management Services to conduct research and planning regarding the total manpower needs of all offices, departments, agencies, boards, and commissions of the executive branch. Effective immediately.
Title
PERSONNEL-MANPOWER STUDIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 415 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3222&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3222.htm |