IL SB3231 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Creates a special instant scratch-off game for the benefit of the Lyme Disease Innovation Program, which helps to further education and awareness of Lyme disease in Illinois. Provides that the game shall commence on January 1, 2025 or as soon thereafter as is reasonably practical. Provides that funds raised from the purchase of the instant scratch-off game shall be deposited into the Lyme Disease Awareness Fund. Provides that the marketing of any other instant scratch-off game shall not be unreasonably diminished during the promotion and sale of the Lyme disease instant scratch-off. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
GAMING-LYME AWARENESS GAME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Gaming, Wagering, and Racing |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 21.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1605 | 9.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3231&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3231.htm |