IL SB3244 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the of the Illinois Insurance Code. Merges the Health Maintenance Organization Guaranty Association Article of the Health Maintenance Organization Act into the Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Law. Makes conforming changes. Provides that the rights, powers, privileges, assets, property, duties, debts, obligations, and liabilities of each association prior to merger shall remain with the members of the respective association. Provides the rights, powers, privileges, assets, property, debts, obligations, and liabilities of each association after the merger. Repeals the Health Maintenance Organization Guaranty Association Article of the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-LIFE HEALTH GUARANTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 125 | Art. VI | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |