IL SB3269 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Held in Public Health |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Held in Public Health |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Public Health |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William Delgado |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Mu |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3960 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |