IL SB3292 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Concealed Carry Permit Pilot Program Act. Establishes a 2 year pilot program based in the City of Peoria that allows the City to issue a permit to a resident of Peoria, who meets the qualifications provided in this Act, authorizing the resident to carry a concealed handgun within the boundaries of the City of Peoria. Amends the Criminal Code of 1961 to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARMS-CONCEALED CARRY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-03 | To Public Health Subcommittee on Special Issues | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale E. Risinger |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3292&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3292.htm |