IL SB3292 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0888
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0888
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Disease Laboratories Act. Provides that the Department of Agriculture may establish and collect reasonable fees for services (instead of diagnostic services) performed by such animal disease laboratories. Removes language that provides the Department may establish and collect reasonable fees for providing analyses of research samples, out-of-state samples, non-agricultural samples, and survey project samples. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMAL DISEASE-LABORATORY FEES
Sponsors
Sen. John Sullivan [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Rep. Frank Mautino [D] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] |
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0888 |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2012 |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-11 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2012-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2012-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-03-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 29, 2012 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |