IL SB3374 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 concerning court appointed special advocates. Defines "court appointed special advocate". Provides that a court appointed special advocate shall: (1) conduct an independent assessment to monitor the facts and circumstances surrounding the case by monitoring the court order; (2) maintain regular and sufficient in-person contact with the minor; (3) submit written reports to the court regarding the minor's best interests; (4) advocate for timely court hearings to obtain permanency for the minor; (5) be notified of all administrative case reviews pertaining to the minor as defined by and work with the parties' attorneys, the guardian ad litem, and others assigned to the minor's case to protect the minor's health, safety, and best interests and insure the proper delivery of child welfare services; (6) attend all court hearings and other proceedings to advocate for the minor's best interests; (7) monitor compliance with the case plan and all court orders; and (8) review all court related documents. Provides that upon presentation of an order of appointment, a court appointed special advocate shall have access to all records and information relevant to the minor's case. Provides that all records and information acquired, reviewed, or produced by a court appointed special advocate during the course of his or her appointment shall be deemed confidential and shall not be disclosed except as ordered by the court.
Title
JUV CT-COURT APP SPEC ADVOCATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 2-17.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |