IL SB3385 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Rate Equity Act. Provides that, beginning in 2023, and every State fiscal year thereafter, the General Assembly shall appropriate sufficient funds to the Department of Human Services to ensure grants to community-based prevention organizations and providers of mental health and substance use disorder treatment under community service grant programs will be adjusted upward by an amount equal to the Consumer Price Index-U from the previous year, not to exceed 2% in any State fiscal year. Requires similar appropriations to be made to increase the reimbursement rates for certified community mental health centers and behavioral health clinics and licensed or certified community-based substance use disorder treatment providers. Amends the Substance Use Disorder Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to implement incremental rate increases for all community-based substance use disorder treatment and intervention services beginning July 1, 2020 and every State fiscal year thereafter. Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Requires the Department to implement incremental rate increases for all community-based mental health treatment services beginning July 1, 2020 and every State fiscal year thereafter. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2020, reimbursement rates for psychiatric and behavioral health services provided by community mental health centers or behavioral health clinics shall be increased by 9%. Requires incremental rate increases beginning July 1, 2021 and every State fiscal year thereafter. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Permits the Departments of Human Services and Healthcare and Family Services to adopt emergency rules. Effective immediately.
Title
MENTAL HLTH/SUBSTANCE USE-RATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 55-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.05a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3385&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3385.htm |