IL SB3423 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Carryout Bag Fee Act. Provides that a carryout bag fee of $0.10 is imposed on each carryout bag used by a customer at retail establishments, except in municipalities with a population greater than 1,000,000, with $0.03 being returned to the retail establishment, $0.04 into the Carryout Bag Fee Fund, $0.01 to the Prairie Research Institute of the University of Illinois, $0.01 into the Solid Waste Management Fund, and $0.01 into the Partners for Conservation Fund. Provides that the carryout bag fee does not apply to the retail sale or use of carryout bags that are used to carry items purchased under specified governmental food assistance programs. Repeals the new Act on January 1, 2026. Amends the State Finance Act making conforming changes. Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county or municipality may not ban, place a fee or tax on, or regulate in any other manner the use, disposition, content, taxation, or sale of carryout bags. Limits the applicability of the provisions as they relate to a county or municipality that charged a fee or tax on carryout bags on May 1, 2020 and specified recycling programs. Limits home rule powers.
Title
CARRYOUT BAG FEE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1186 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-42-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3423&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3423.htm |