IL SB3452 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Removes kidney disease treatment centers from the Act's application. In granting permits, provides that the Health Facilities and Services Review Board may consider the area's population growth but may not consider the applicant's charity care. Requires that the Governor determine compensation for the voting members of the Health Facilities and Services Review Board commensurate with their duties and professional credentials. Removes the authority of the Department of Public Health to review and certify applications. Removes the December 31, 2019 repeal date. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH FACILITIES PLANNING
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-08 | To Human Services Subcommittee on Medicaid & Provider Rate Reform | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Brady |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3452&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3452.htm |