IL SB3605 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that it is a Class 4 felony for a child sex offender to knowingly attempt to entice a person under 18 years of age to the entrance of or into a dwelling or structure by means of oral communications, gestures, signage, illumination or any form of electronic communication or to knowingly attempt to entice a person under 18 years of age into a vehicle.
Title
CRIM CD-CHILD SEX OFFENDER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-04 | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Enhancements and Redundancy | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2010-02-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3605&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3605.htm |