IL SB3605 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $12,500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority for grants to the Illinois YouthBuild Coalition. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
$DHS-YOUTHBUILD
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] |
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3605&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB3605.pdf |