IL SB3698 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, beginning in taxable year 2010, an income tax credit is allowed for a taxpayer who is a nursing professor at a public institution of higher education during a taxable year. Specifies the amount of the tax credit. Defines "nursing professor" and "public institution of higher education". Provides that any excess credit shall be refunded to the taxpayer. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CREDIT-NURSING TEACHERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-03 | Postponed - Public Health | |
2010-02-23 | Postponed - Public Health | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3698&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3698.htm |