IL SB3720 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1087
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1087
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of Senate Amendment No. 2 with the following changes: Provides that the steering committee shall include 5 staff members from the Department of Children and Family Services (rather than 3 staff members from the Department) which shall include a child protection investigator and a child protection supervisor. Requires the steering committee to include in the development of the Bias-Free Child Removal Pilot Program (i) a decision regarding a timeline for convening the Bias-Free Case Review Team and (ii) how and when the child protection investigator or child protection supervisor shall present an investigation to the Bias-Free Case Review Team. Provides that the pilot program shall not prevent a child protection investigator or supervisor from performing routine assignments required under Department policy after taking protective custody of a child. Provides that the redaction of case file information or the preparation of case files for the Review Team shall not be completed by the child protection investigator or the child protection supervisor. In a provision requiring the Review Team to make a final decision on whether a child's removal should be upheld, removes language requiring the Review Team to make that final decision as soon as possible but no later than 48 hours prior to a shelter care hearing. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-BIAS-FREE CHILD REMOVAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1087 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Effective Date June 10, 2022 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2022-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-23 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-03-18 | House | Re-assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-03-14 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-03-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-000-000 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Villa |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 24, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |