IL SB3725 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2024, certain food, drugs, and medical appliances that were taxed at the rate of 1% shall be exempt from the taxes under those Acts. Provides that certain amounts shall be transferred from the General Revenue Fund to certain local tax funds. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-GROCERIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3725&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3725.htm |