IL SB3728 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0999
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0999
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the University of Illinois Scientific Surveys Act. Changes the effective date of the Act for all provisions to July 1, 2008. Provides that all actions taken under the Act by the Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois and by the officers, employees, and agents of the University of Illinois on or after July 1, 2008 and before the effective date of the amendatory Act are hereby ratified, validated, and confirmed as valid and lawful acts by the Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois and by the officers, employees, and agents of the University of Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
U OF I-SURVEYS ACT-EFF DATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0999 | |
2010-07-02 | Effective Date July 2, 2010 | |
2010-07-02 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-23 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2010-04-23 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-04-23 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-04-23 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-23 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-04-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-03-11 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2010 | |
2010-02-25 | Second Reading | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 24, 2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Do Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Higher Education | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |