IL SJR0047 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolves that the House of Representatives and the Senate direct the use of increased FMAP (Federal Medical Assistance Percentage) to support current efforts to serve the needs of beneficiaries and maintain or enhance those efforts as appropriate.
Title
DHFS-STATE MEDICAID PLAN-FMAP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Postponed - Human Services | |
2009-04-28 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-03-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-06 | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=47&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SJR/09600SJ0047.htm |