IN HB1008 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the article listing criminal law statutes for titles outside IC 35, and reorganizes the criminal law statutes into individual sections under a new article. Does not make any substantive change in the law. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the code revision commission.)
Title
Publication of list of criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 100802 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-08 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 100801 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 100802 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-08 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 100801 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Law 169 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 206: yeas 46 and nays 0 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law |
2014-01-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 18: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-15 | House | Senator M. Young added as first sponsor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Senator Hume added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-14 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-14 | House | Amendment #2 (Bartlett) motion withdrawn. |
2014-01-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-07 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Steurwald |
2014-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative Pryor |