IN HB1108 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Development restrictions on slopes. Prohibits a unit from preventing development exclusively on the basis of slope, if the predevelopment slope of the site is less than 25%, unless the site is within a watershed area of a reservoir that is a source of a municipality's drinking water.
Title
Development restrictions on slopes.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hall [R] | Rep. Chris May [R] | Rep. Robert Heaton [R] | Rep. Shane Lindauer [R] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Randy Maxwell [R] | Sen. Gary Byrne [R] |
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Public Law 52 |
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as cosponsor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 39, nays 10 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senators Maxwell, Byrne, Leising added as cosponsors |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second sponsor |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-23 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch |
2024-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 69, nays 27 |
2024-01-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2024-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Hall |
2024-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representatives May, Heaton, Lindauer |