IN HB1274 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Law 154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Law 154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indiana semiquincentennial license plate. Provides for a semiquincentennial license plate. Establishes the semiquincentennial trust fund.
Title
Indiana semiquincentennial license plate.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Renee Pack [D] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Public Law 154 |
2024-03-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 290: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 257: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senator Alting added as cosponsor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2024-01-30 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Qaddoura |
2024-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2024-01-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2024-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |
2024-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative Pack |