IN HB1343 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals obsolete provisions concerning an interim study of motorized bicycles. Defines "Class A motor driven cycle", "Class B motor driven cycle", and "motor driven cycle". Repeals the definitions of "motor scooter" and "motorized bicycle". Provides that the county motor vehicle excise surtax and the motor vehicle excise tax apply to motor driven cycles. Requires that motor driven cycles must be registered with the bureau of motor vehicles. Excludes motor driven cycles from titling requirements. Requires that a license plate must be displayed on a motor driven cycle. Provides that certain equipment requirements and traffic regulations apply to motor driven cycles. Requires an individual who operates a Class A motor driven cycle to hold a valid driver's license with a motorcycle endorsement or a motorcycle endorsement with a Class A motor driven cycle restriction and to provide proof of financial responsibility. Requires an individual who operates a Class B motor driven cycle to hold an unexpired identification card with a Class B motor driven cycle endorsement or a valid driver's license. Provides that a motor driven cycle may not be operated on an interstate highway. Provides that the operation of a Class B motor driven cycle may be a defense to certain motor vehicle offenses. Excludes motor driven cycles from: (1) the definition of "motorized cart" for purposes of certain natural resource laws; and (2) certain motor vehicle protection laws. Makes technical corrections. Reconciles a conflict with HEA 1006-2013 and other criminal law bills enacted in the 2013 legislative session.
Title
Motor driven cycles.
Sponsors
Rep. David Wolkins [R] | Rep. Gail Riecken [D] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] |
Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 134302 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 134301 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 134302 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 134301 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 221 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 331: yeas 26 and nays 22 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Becker added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Wyss added third sponsor. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 204: yeas 81 and nays 14 |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Buck added as first sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Boots added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-27 | House | Representative Riecken added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Representative M. Smith added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Roads and Transportation |
2014-01-15 | House | Coauthored by: Representatives McNamara and Sullivan |
2014-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Wolkins. |