IN HCR0005 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Representative Lehman added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Representative Lehman added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urging INDOT to rename that portion of I-69 between the County Road 11A Exit and State Road 8, near mile marker 326, the "Master Trooper James R. Bailey Memorial Highway. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that portion of I-69 between the County Road 11A Exit and State Road 8, near mile marker 326, the "Master Trooper James R. Bailey Memorial Highway".
Title
Urging INDOT to rename that portion of I-69 between the County Road 11A Exit and State Road 8, near mile marker 326, the "Master Trooper James R. Bailey Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Sen. Tyler Johnson [R] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-16 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Representative Lehman added as coauthor |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-16 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 11: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2024-01-16 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Johnson T and Glick |
2024-01-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2024-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative Pressel |
2024-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Smaltz |