IN SB0049 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Catastrophically disabled veteran hunting. Provides that catastrophically disabled veterans may hunt on the same free hunting days as those designated for youth hunters by the director of the department of natural resources. Defines "catastrophically disabled".
Title
Catastrophically disabled veteran hunting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 12 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-22 | House | Representative Lindauer added as cosponsor |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Zent and Judy |
2024-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Abbott |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as coauthor |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as third author |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski removed as coauthor |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as coauthor |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senators Alexander, Byrne, Qaddoura added as coauthors |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Glick |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second author |