IN SB0264 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Religious exemption from worker's compensation. Provides an exemption from worker's compensation and occupational diseases coverage for a member of certain religious sects or a division of a religious sect who meets certain requirements and obtains a certificate of exemption (certificate) from the worker's compensation board (board). Provides that if certain information about an individual who holds a certificate is no longer true: (1) the individual and the individual's employer must take certain steps; and (2) the certificate is no longer effective. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Religious exemption from worker's compensation.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] |
Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Rep. Shane Lindauer [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senators Walker G, Crane, Doriot, Zay added as coauthors |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second author |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Lehman |
2024-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lindauer |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-16 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bassler |