IN SB0366 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTIONS 35 through 42 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTIONS 35 through 42 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers responsibilities from administering specified federal food and nutrition program funds from the office of the lieutenant governor to the state department of health (state department). Requires the state department to annually inspect certain department of corrections facilities only if the facility is not accredited by a national accrediting organization. Creates the health care facility advisory council within the state department. Requires, beginning October 1, 2013, hospitals to record external cause-of-injury code for each individual who receives care in the emergency department of the hospital. Requires certain certified nurse aides to be certified by the state department, and requires the state department to: (1) establish a program; (2) prescribe education and training programs; (3) determine specified standards; and (4) establish annual certification fees; for certified nurse aides who work in health facilities. Requires the state department to maintain a registry for certified nurse aides and registered home health aides. Removes the requirements that a candidate must meet to be appointed director of the program for children with special health care needs. Authorizes a physician last in attendance of a deceased to initiate the document process for the death record and defines physician to include individuals with specified physician permits. Specifies that certain licensed professionals are subject to discipline under the person's license instead of committing a Class B misdemeanor for violating the statutes concerning vital statistics and specifies that the state department may not start sanctioning providers for certain violations until January 1, 2012. Requires the health finance commission to study whether hospitals should be required to report hospital employee influenza immunization rates to the state department. Repeals: (1) provisions establishing the hospital council, the home health care services and hospice services council, and the Indiana health facilities council; and (2) the requirement that the state department design, promote, and sell heirloom birth certificates.
Title
State department of health matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | SECTIONS 35 through 42 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | SECTION 34 effective 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | SECTION 33 effective retroactive to 12/31/2010 | |
2011-05-18 | SECTIONS 1 through 32 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 156 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 516: yeas 49, nays 0 | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 724: yeas 87, nays 10 | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-25 | House advisors appointed: Crouch, VanNatter and Reske | |
2011-04-25 | House conferees appointed: T. Brown and C. Brown | |
2011-04-25 | Senate advisors appointed: Lawson and Grooms | |
2011-04-25 | Senate conferees appointed: Miller and Simpson | |
2011-04-25 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 567: yeas 94, nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 1 (T. Brown), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-02-22 | Cosponsor: Rep. C. Brown | |
2011-02-22 | House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 48 and nays 0 | |
2011-02-17 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-15 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2011-01-18 | Senator Simpson added as third author | |
2011-01-18 | Senator Lawson added as second author | |
2011-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-01-11 | Authored by Senator Miller |