IN SB0398 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School bus stop arm violations. Provides that a law enforcement officer may arrest a person when the officer has probable cause to believe that the person has committed a misdemeanor by recklessly passing a school bus when the arm signal device of the bus is in the extended position. (Current law requires the officer to have probable cause to believe that the person is committing or attempting to commit the misdemeanor in the officer's presence.)
Title
School bus stop arm violations. Provides that a law enforcement officer may arrest a person when the officer has probable cause to believe that the person has committed a misdemeanor by recklessly passing a school bus when the arm signal device of the bus is in the extended position. (Current law requires the officer to have probable cause to believe that the person is committing or attempting to commit the misdemeanor in the officer's presence.)
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Rep. Matthew Ubelhor [R] |
Rep. Dennis Zent [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Representative Zent added as cosponsor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as third author |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Representative Ubelhor added as sponsor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 38, nays 11 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senator Ford added as second author |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bassler |