KS H2332 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Summary
Recodification of certain drug crimes; quantities of drugs; proportionality of sentencing. Effective date: 07/01/2010 & Statute Bk.
Title
Recodification of certain drug crimes; quantities of drugs; proportionality of sentencing. Effective date: 07/01/2010 & Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died on General Orders in House | |
2009-03-11 | CR: Be passed as am. by Corrections and Juvenile Justice -HJ 274 | |
2009-02-18 | Hearing: Wed., 2/25/09, 1:30PM, Rm 535-N; Hearing: Thurs., 2/26/09, 1:30PM, Rm 535-N | |
2009-02-13 | Referred to Corrections and Juvenile Justice -HJ 163 | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced -HJ 160 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |